GA HB787 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-11-126 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to having or carrying handguns, long guns, or other weapons, license requirement, and exceptions for homes, motor vehicles, private property, and other locations and conditions, so as to expand weapons carry license reciprocity in this state; to provide that persons who are not residents of this state shall be authorized to carry a weapon in this state if licensed to carry in any other state; to provide that the Attorney General shall enter into an agreement with any state that requires an agreement to recognize and give effect to weapons carry licenses for reciprocity; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; weapons carry license reciprocity in this state; expand
Sponsors
Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Martin Momtahan [R] |
Rep. John LaHood [R] | Rep. Micah Gravley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-16 | House | House Hopper |