GA HB809 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the Warner Robins Public Facilities Authority; to provide for a short title; to provide for definitions; to provide for its purpose; to provide for its powers; to provide for the membership of the authority and their terms of office, qualifications, and compensation; to provide for the issuance and sale of revenue bonds and other obligations; to provide that such revenues and other obligations are not general obligations; to provide for trust indentures; to provide for the security for such revenue bonds and other obligations; to provide for refunding revenue bonds and other obligations; to provide for exemptions from taxation; to provide for tort immunity; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Warner Robins Public Facilities Authority Act; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #414 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - House - House Vote #335 - Local Calendar (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 31 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - House - House Vote #335 - Local Calendar (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 31 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Effective Date | |
2009-05-11 | Act 258 | |
2009-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-08 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-26 | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate | |
2009-03-26 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-26 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-26 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-25 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-23 | House First Readers |