GA HB82 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Effective Date 2024-05-15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Effective Date 2024-05-15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to imposition, rate, computation, exemptions, and credits relative to state income taxes, so as to limit eligibility for the rural physician tax credit to persons qualifying as a rural physician on or before December 31, 2023; to provide for automatic repeal; to create a new tax credit for rural physicians, dentists, nurse practitioners, and physician assistants; to provide for conditions and limitations; to provide for an aggregate cap; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax; limit eligibility for rural physician tax credit to physicians who qualify on or before December 31, 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Mack Jackson [D] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Al Williams [D] |
Rep. James Beverly [D] | Rep. Patty Stinson [D] | Sen. Max Burns [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #874 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #859 (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 101, Hb 946, Hb 581, Hr 1022, Hb 264, Hb 974, Hb 976, Hb 977, Hb 1021, Hb 1207, Hb 814, Hb 82, Hb 971, Hb 1182, Hr 804, Hr 96: Senate Vote #763 (Y: 32 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 31, Hb 82, Hb 86, Hb 230, Hb 290, Hb 412, Hb 454, Hb 504: Senate Vote #297 (Y: 33 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - Passage: House Vote #182 (Y: 175 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #859 (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 101, Hb 946, Hb 581, Hr 1022, Hb 264, Hb 974, Hb 976, Hb 977, Hb 1021, Hb 1207, Hb 814, Hb 82, Hb 971, Hb 1182, Hr 804, Hr 96: Senate Vote #763 (Y: 32 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 31, Hb 82, Hb 86, Hb 230, Hb 290, Hb 412, Hb 454, Hb 504: Senate Vote #297 (Y: 33 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - Passage: House Vote #182 (Y: 175 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Effective Date 2024-05-15 | |
2024-04-19 | Act 386 | |
2024-04-19 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-06 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-06 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-02 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-01-31 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-01-30 | House | House First Readers |
2023-01-26 | House | House Hopper |