GA HB843 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-20 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-20 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to regulation of alcoholic beverages generally, so as to provide for Sunday sales of alcoholic beverages for consumption on the premises in locally designated special entertainment districts; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; Sunday sales for consumption on the premises in locally designated special entertainment districts; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - Passage: House Vote #531 (Y: 151 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-08 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-29 | House | House Hopper |