GA HB862 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 14 of Title 10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to cemetery and funeral services, so as to provide additional time under certain circumstances for purchasers of burial lots, burial rights, burial merchandise, and burial services to pursue a civil cause of action against sellers that violate certain laws; to specify the civil remedies available for such violations; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Funeral services; additional time for purchasers of burial lots and burial services to pursue a civil cause of action against sellers that violate certain laws; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Patty Stinson [D] | Rep. Rhonda Burnough [D] | Rep. Kim Schofield [D] |
Rep. Viola Davis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-26 | House | House Hopper |
2021-11-22 | House | House Prefiled |