GA HB887 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Articles 3 and 4 of Chapter 11 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to dependency proceedings and termination of parental rights, respectively, so as to prioritize the placement of a child with a relative who is an adult or fictive kin when such individual is qualified to care for such child and it is in the best interests of the child; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Courts; parental rights; prioritize placement of a child with an adult or fictive kin qualified to care for such child
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. Regina Quick [R] | Rep. Johnnie Caldwell [R] |
Rep. Stacey Abrams [D] | Rep. Stacey Evans [D] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #754 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Vote #821 (Y: 125 N: 36 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Vote #822 (Y: 122 N: 44 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #592 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House Vote #636 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Vote #821 (Y: 125 N: 36 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Vote #822 (Y: 122 N: 44 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #592 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House Vote #636 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 337 | |
2016-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2016-03-22 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-03 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-02 | House | House Hopper |