GA HB896 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Effective Date 2024-04-22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Effective Date 2024-04-22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 19 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to divorce, so as to provide for a process by which individuals may change their married surname to a prior surname or the given surname on their birth certificate following a divorce; to provide for applicability; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Domestic relations; process by which individuals may change their married surname to previous surname following divorce; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Kimberly New [R] | Rep. Jodi Lott [R] | Rep. Joseph Gullett [R] | Rep. David Huddleston [R] |
Rep. Bethany Ballard [R] | Rep. Brent Cox [R] | Sen. Jason Anavitarte [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #751 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Passage: House Vote #505 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Passage: House Vote #505 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Effective Date 2024-04-22 | |
2024-04-22 | Act 397 | |
2024-04-22 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-11 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-10 | House | House Hopper |