GA HB980 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a new charter for the City of Gainesville, approved April 11, 1979 (Ga. L. 1979, p. 3302), as amended, particularly by an Act approved June 3, 2003, (Ga. L. 2003, p. 4670), so as to revise the districts for the election of members of the board of education; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for submission of this Act for preclearance pursuant to Section 5 of the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Gainesville, City of; board of education; revise districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #530 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Vote #514 - Local Calendar (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 20 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Vote #514 - Local Calendar (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 20 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | Effective Date | |
2012-03-05 | Act 347 | |
2012-03-05 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-03-05 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-22 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-22 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-22 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-16 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-15 | House First Readers |