GA HB986 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act establishing the State Court of Lowndes County, approved December 11, 1901 (Ga. L. 1901, p. 176), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 21, 1968 (Ga. L. 1968, p. 2332) and an Act approved April 4, 1991 (Ga. L. 1991, p. 3551), so as to provide an additional judge for said court; to provide for the initial appointment of such additional judge by the Governor; to provide for the election and terms of office for the judges of said court; to provide for a chief judge of said court; to provide for the compensation of the judges of said court; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Lowndes County State Court; provide additional judge; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #529 (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Vote #547 (Y: 156 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Vote #547 (Y: 156 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-16 | Act 541 | |
2014-04-16 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-25 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-02-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-02-19 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2014-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-17 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2014-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-10 | House | House Hopper |