GA HR1135 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on Credit Card Fees on State Sales and Excise Tax and Their Impact on Georgia Merchants and Consumers; and for other purposes.
Title
House Study Committee on Credit Card Fee on State Sales and Excise Tax and Their Impact on Georgia Merchants and Consumers; create
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Jones [R] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Teri Anulewicz [D] |
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Jason Ridley [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - Adopt: House Vote #846 (Y: 164 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-15 | House | House Hopper |