GA HR1325 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the Congress of the United States to amend the Communications Act of 1934 and FCC rules so as to permit the use of "cellular jammers" to prevent illegal cell phone use in prison facilities; and for other purposes.
Title
Congress; amend Communication Act of 1934; permit use of cellular jammers; urge
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Cheokas [R] | Rep. Doug Collins [R] | Rep. Steve Davis [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] |
Rep. Jay Neal [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-16 - House - House Vote #489 - Adopt (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-16 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-16 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-08 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-07 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-06 | House First Readers |