GA HR354 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the Georgia Department of Education, in consultation with the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Disabilities and mental health experts, to develop and provide to local school systems a list of training materials that would serve to increase awareness of mental health issues and behavioral and learning disabilities; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Department of Education; develop and provide a list of training materials to increase awareness of mental health issues and disabilities; urge
Sponsors
Rep. Dar'shun Kendrick [D] | Rep. Kimberly Alexander [D] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] |
Rep. Joyce Chandler [R] | Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-30 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-21 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/50817 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/165977 |