GA HR4 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing a settlement of the boundary dispute between the State of Georgia and the State of Tennessee; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia and Tennessee; boundary dispute; propose settlement
Sponsors
Rep. Harry Geisinger [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Larry O'Neal [R] | Rep. Stacey Abrams [D] |
Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] | Rep. Carolyn Hugley [D] | Sen. David Shafer [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - House - House Vote #397 (Y: 157 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #249 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House Vote #39 (Y: 171 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #249 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House Vote #39 (Y: 171 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | Effective Date | |
2013-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-26 | House | House Agrees Senate Amend or Sub |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-02-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-04 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-01 | House | House Hopper |
2012-12-13 | House | House Prefiled |