GA HR584 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on Exploring a Floor and Trade Charity Care System; and for other purposes.
Title
House Study Committee on Exploring a Floor and Trade Charity Care System; create
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Jones [R] | Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. Spencer Frye [D] |
Rep. Clay Pirkle [R] | Rep. Debra Bazemore [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #337 (Y: 163 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-18 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/56001 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/184919 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/56001#17107 |