GA SB140 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 7 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to regulation of hospitals and related institutions, so as to prohibit certain surgical procedures for the treatment of gender dysphoria in minors from being performed in hospitals and other licensed healthcare facilities; to provide for exceptions; to provide for violations; to amend Article 1 of Chapter 34 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Composite Medical Board, so as to prohibit certain surgical procedures for the treatment of gender dysphoria in minors; to provide for exceptions; to provide for violations; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Hospitals; the treatment of gender dysphoria in minors performed in hospitals and other licensed healthcare facilities; prohibit certain surgical procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #259 (Y: 31 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Motion To Table: Senate Vote #258 (Y: 21 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Motion For The Previous Question: Senate Vote #257 (Y: 31 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Immediately Transmit: House Vote #244 (Y: 97 N: 74 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Passage: House Vote #243 (Y: 96 N: 75 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #192 (Y: 33 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Motion To Remove From The Table: Senate Vote #191 (Y: 32 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Motion To Table: Senate Vote #258 (Y: 21 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Motion For The Previous Question: Senate Vote #257 (Y: 31 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Immediately Transmit: House Vote #244 (Y: 97 N: 74 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Passage: House Vote #243 (Y: 96 N: 75 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #192 (Y: 33 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Motion To Remove From The Table: Senate Vote #191 (Y: 32 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Effective Date 2023-07-01 | |
2023-03-23 | Act 4 | |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2023-03-16 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2023-03-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate Hopper |