GA SB347 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-28 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-28 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 15-6-2 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the number of judges of superior courts, so as to provide for an additional judge of the superior courts of the Tallapoosa Judicial Circuit; to provide for the appointment of such additional judge by the Governor; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Tallapoosa Judicial Circuit; additional judge of the superior courts; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - Passage: House Vote #822 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #622 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #622 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-03-05 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2024-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Senate Hopper |