GA SB440 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act entitled "An Act to reincorporate the City of Roswell in the County of Fulton," approved April 19, 2000 (Ga. L. 2000, p. 3844), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 28, 2010 (Ga. L. 2010, p. 3650), so as to modify term limits for the mayor of the City of Roswell; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Roswell; modify term limits for the mayor
Sponsors
Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #615 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-03-16 | House | House First Readers |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |