GA SB571 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Act 630
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Act 630
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for a new charter for the City of Sandersville, approved March 28, 1990 (Ga. L. 1990, p. 4823), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 6, 2015 (Ga. L. 2015, p. 3733), so as to revise the powers of the mayor; to restate provisions related to the mayor pro tempore; to provide for a council-manager form of government; to provide for the selection, qualifications, and duties of the city manager; to update and restate provisions related to the administration of the city government; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Sandersville; powers of the mayor; revise
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #763 (Y: 171 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #672 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #672 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Act 630 | |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-03-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-20 | House | House First Readers |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Hopper |