GA SB93 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 1 of Chapter 3 of Title 27 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding hunting, so as to authorize the use of suppressors on hunting firearms under certain circumstances; to provide for suspension of hunting privileges for persons who are convicted of hunting without landowner permission, hunting in an area that is closed to hunting, or hunting big game out of season or at night with a suppressor equipped firearm; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Wildlife; authorize the use of suppressors on hunting firearms under certain circumstances
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Heath [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Ross Tolleson [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] |
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #513 (Y: 43 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2014-03-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-03-20 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2014-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-03-03 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hopper |