GA SR609 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Act 708
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Act 708
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION recognizing the Princess Trahlyta and dedicating a roundabout in her memory; and for other purposes.
Title
Princess Trahlyta; dedicate a roundabout in her memory
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Rep. Will Wade [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - Adopt: House Vote #826 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Adoption By Substitute: Senate Vote #573 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Adoption By Substitute: Senate Vote #573 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Act 708 | |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-29 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |