HI HB1011 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enables the Attorney General to retain and deposit thirty-three percent of recoveries from civil actions or settlements of a civil claim, with exceptions, initiated or prosecuted by the Attorney General to be used for staffing, expenses, equipment and training. Effective January 7, 2059. (HB1011 HD1)
Title
Department of the Attorney General
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Chong, Nakashima excused (2). | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 378) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Luke, Morita, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, Ito, McKelvey. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-10-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1238 (Same As) 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.