HI HB1021 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the director of health to set the deposit beverage container fee at one cent per container until DOH addresses all of the recommendations of the auditor pursuant to the State of Hawaii Deposit Beverage Container Deposit Special Fund Financial and Program Audit of 2010.
Title
Deposit Beverage Container Fee; Moratorium on Administration Fee Increase
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on EEP/HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/HLT on Wednesday, 02-13-13 10:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1021&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1021_.HTM |