HI HB1022 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Act 047, 06/08/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Act 047, 06/08/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that any conservation and resources enforcement officer of the Department of Land and Natural Resources may, in the performance of official duties, stop and temporarily detain any person who the officer reasonably believes is, or recently has been engaged in, hunting or fishing for a natural resource inspection. Establishes penalties. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Taking Of Natural Resources.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Act 047, 06/08/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147). |
2021-06-10 | House | Act 047, on 06/08/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147). |
2021-04-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Kapela, Kong, McKelvey, Perruso, Tokioka, Wildberger voting no (8) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). |
2021-04-22 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 80). |
2021-04-22 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-27-21. |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 80) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-20 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Rhoads. |
2021-04-20 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima. |
2021-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 842). |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-21 2:30PM; CR 016. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Kanuha, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Nakashima, Marten Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2021-04-16 | House | Re-referred to EEP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2021-04-15 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 741) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1706) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Shimabukuro. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-06-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1242) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL, WAM/JDC. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-21 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 86). |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Kapela, Kong, Tokioka voting no (5) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 742), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-24 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Tokioka. |
2021-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Kapela voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 422) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-11 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-11-21 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-02 | House | Re-referred to EEP, JHA, referral sheet 4 |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1176 (Same As) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.