HI HB1024 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent the liability protections for the actions of county lifeguards.
Title
Liability; County Lifeguards
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 476), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman, C. Lee. |
2013-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-13 10:45AM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-06-13 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |