HI HB1026 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1026
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Board of Land and Natural Resources to approve rental reductions or waivers for leases on public lands that require substantial demolition or infrastructure improvement costs in order for the lessee to utilize the premises.
Title
Relating To Rentals For Public Land Leases.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1026 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB1252 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
SB1252 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1026&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1026_.HTM |