HI HB1029 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 257, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1366).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 257, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1366).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the composition of the Endangered Species Recovery Committee by replacing the University of Hawaii Environmental Center's Director with the Dean of the University of Hawaii at Manoa College of Natural Sciences. (SD1)
Title
Endangered Species Recovery Committee; University of Hawaii at Manoa College of Natural Sciences.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Act 257, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1366). |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Act 257, 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1366). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2016-05-03 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2016-04-29 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-16. |
2016-04-28 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, C. Lee, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-26 | House | Conference Committee will have decision making on Thursday 04-28-16 11:00AM in Conference Room 224. |
2016-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 687). |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Wakai Co-Chair; Gabbard, Slom. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Cullen Co-Chairs; C. Lee, Matsumoto. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 508) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from HEA/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3448) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Baker, Espero, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Slom, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HEA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Gabbard, K.Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-16 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to HEA/EET. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 178). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 973-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-03-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-03-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-19 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Souki excused (2). |
2015-02-19 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 370), recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-02-17 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Ito, Kong, LoPresti, Ohno, Takumi, Tsuji, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Say, Tupola. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-17-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee excused (1). |
2015-02-12 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 137), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. |
2015-02-06 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-06-15 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to WAL, HED, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-27 | House | Pending introduction. |