HI HB1030 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1030
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends fines for destroying or harvesting trees or tree products, including koa, on state forest reserves lands to an amount up to $10,000 or three times the market value at the time and place of the violation for each tree, whichever is greater, in addition to any costs associated with restoration or replacement of the habitat and damages to public land or natural resources, or any combination thereof. Clarifies that any person violating any provision of part II (Forest Reserves) of chapter 183, Hawaii Revised Statutes, or any rule adopted pursuant thereto, other than section 183-17, Hawaii Revised Statutes, shall be guilty of a petty misdemeanor. Decriminalizes traffic infractions within forest reserves and sets fine amounts. Repeals the general penalty provision of section 183-4, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
Relating To Certain Penalties For Violations Of Subtitle 4.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1256 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
HB1030 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1030 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1030&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1030_.HTM |