HI HB1034 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1034
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that any police officer or agent of the Department of Land and Natural Resources upon whom the Board of Land and Natural Resources has conferred police powers may, in the performance of their primary duties, inspect certain items for compliance with title 12, chapters 6D, 6E, and 6K, Hawaii Revised Statutes, and any rule adopted thereunder, relating to the protection and conservation of natural resources.
Title
Relating To The Taking Of Natural Resources.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1260 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB1034 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1034 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1034&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1034_.HTM |