HI HB1038 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1038
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Act 88, Session Laws of Hawaii 2006, to extend the sunset date for the amendments made to section 235-17, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Amends section 235-17(h), Hawaii Revised Statues, to require taxpayers claiming the tax credit to submit an independent certification of the qualified production costs.
Title
Relating To The Motion Picture, Digital Media, And Film Production Income Tax Credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB904 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB1038 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5
HB1038 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1038&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1038_.HTM |