HI HB104 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB104
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes recreational athletic venues and cultural activities on existing golf courses within agricultural districts.
Title
Relating To Agricultural Districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-01-19 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to AGR, WLH, FIN , referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB104 (Carry Over) 2019-02-01 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=104&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB104_.HTM |