HI HB1040 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1040
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Received from Governor Emergency Appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 2).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Received from Governor Emergency Appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 2).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides emergency appropriations in fiscal year 2020-2021 to the Department of Public Safety to continue funding for various COVID-19 response related programs and activities.
Title
Making Emergency Appropriations To The Department Of Public Safety Relating To Covid-19 Expenditures.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | House | Received from Governor Emergency Appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 2). |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to PDP/CMV, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1040 (Carry Over) 2021-02-22 - Received from Governor Emergency Appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 2).
SB1194 (Same As) 2021-05-11 - Act 013, 05/07/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1113).
SB1194 (Same As) 2021-05-11 - Act 013, 05/07/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1113).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1040&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB1040_.HTM |