HI HB1041 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts the use of leaf blowers to two hours between 9 a.m. and 5 p.m. on any day. Makes it illegal to operate a gasoline-powered leaf blower within a residential zone unless the operator is personnel of a licensed business.
Title
Leaf Blowers; Noise
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-26-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-19 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-13 2:00PM. |
2013-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-19-13 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1041&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1041_.HTM |