HI HB1042 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1042
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adopts a more explicit definition of "small business"; clarifies the powers of the Small Business Regulatory Review Board; increases the number of board members, with two nominated by the Board; clarifies when agencies are required to report to the Board and when the Board is required to report to the Legislature. (HB1042 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Small Business Regulatory Flexibility Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 645) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-15 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Holt, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson. |
2017-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-15-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1042 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
SB908 (Same As) 2017-07-12 - Act 174, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1288).
SB908 (Same As) 2017-07-12 - Act 174, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1288).