HI HB1056 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1056
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-27 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-27 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To provide appropriations for collective bargaining cost items and other public employment costs for Unit (10) and their excluded counterparts, including the cost of salary adjustments negotiated between the State and the bargaining unit representative for fiscal biennium 2017-2019.
Title
Relating To Public Employment Cost Items.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1056 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5
SB922 (Same As) 2017-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
SB922 (Same As) 2017-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1056&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB1056_.HTM |