HI HB1056 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1056
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the department of Hawaiian home lands to assume historic preservation review of the effect of any proposed project for lands under its jurisdiction, except for projects affecting properties listed or nominated for inclusion in the Hawaii register of historic places or the national register of historic places or located in a designated historic district and under certain conditions. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Historic Preservation Reviews.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2023-02-16 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 505) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2023-02-07 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-07-23 9:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1056 (Carry Over) 2023-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
SB1354 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 17
SB1354 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 17