HI HB1059 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-10 - (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-10 - (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To 1) appropriate funds and positions in fiscal year 20102011 to enable staffing of the Offices of the Governor and the Lieutenant Governor from January 2011 through June 2011; and 2) appropriate positions and funds for Deputy and/or Deputy's secretary for specified positions.
Title
Relating to the Budget
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-10 | (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 15 | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Received from Governor re: emergency appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 99). | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to ERB/PBM, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1286 (Same As) 2011-02-24 - (H) Act 003, on 2/23/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1103).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1059 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HB1059_.htm |