HI HB1063 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1063
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making the nursing facility sustainability program and exemptions from the special fund assessments permanent. Make changes to strengthen the nursing facility sustainability program and other nonsubstantive changes for consistency and clarify. Appropriates funds out of the nursing facility sustainability program special fund for fiscal years 2023-2024 and 2024-2025.
Title
Relating To The Nursing Facility Sustainability Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1361 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB1063 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB1063 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1063&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1063_.HTM |