HI HB1069 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to HRE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to HRE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the University of Hawaii to obtain legislative approval regarding the amount of and specific project on which the revenue bonds will be spent prior to issuing revenue bonds. Effective July 1, 2525. (HB1069 HD1)
Title
University of Hawaii; Revenue Bonds
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 120). |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Har, Thielen, Woodson excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 724-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-14 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll, Mizuno, Oshiro excused (4). |
2014-02-12 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 352-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-01-28 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Awana, Hanohano, Ohno, Say, Takumi, Matsumoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takai. |
2014-01-21 | House | Bill re-scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 01-28-14 2:15PM in conference room 309. |
2014-01-21 | House | Meeting Scheduled on Thursday, 01-23-14 2:15PM in conference room 309 has been canceled. |
2014-01-18 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 01-23-14 2:15PM in conference room 309. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-05-13 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1279 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.