HI HB1077 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1077
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a bipartisan commission within the Department of Taxation to review and make recommendations on state expenditures, revenue enhancements, and tax policy. Appropriates moneys.
Title
Relating To Fiscal Responsibility.
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] |
Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1479 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB1077 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1077 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1077&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1077_.HTM |