HI HB1082 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1082
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Division of Financial Institution to employ or retain an attorney for representation, counsel, or document drafting regardless of the subject matter of the action at hand. (HB1082 HD1)
Title
Relating To Governmental Retention Of Attorneys.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2). |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 185) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Cachola, Ito, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 429. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to IAC, LAB, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB948 (Same As)
HB1082 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).
HB1082 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).