HI HB1088 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (H) Act 072, on 6/1/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1175).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (H) Act 072, on 6/1/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1175).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds a section to chapter 353, Hawaii Revised Statutes, relating to the mental health treatment of inmates and detainees in the custody of the Department of Public Safety. Effective July 1, 2011. (HB1088 CD1)
Title
Corrections; Medical Treatment
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | (H) Act 072, on 6/1/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1175). | |
2011-06-06 | (S) Act 072, 6/1/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1175). | |
2011-05-06 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Hee. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 62). | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 62) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-26 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-04-26 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Yamane, Cullen, Fontaine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wooley. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-11 3:30PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 648). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: Aquino, Yamane, Cullen Co-Chairs; Wooley, Fontaine. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 552) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1121) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-04-07 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-04 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-07-11 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) Re-Referred to JDL. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to PGM/HTH, JDL. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 256). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 769) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-24 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Coffman. | |
2011-02-22 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-24-11 10:45AM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 491), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Wooley, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ching. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-15-11 10:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Reported from PBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 111), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HLT. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Souki, Takai, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBM on Thursday, 02-03-11 8:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to PBM, HLT, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1315 (Same As) 2011-01-26 - (S) Referred to WLH/JDL, WAM.