HI HB1088 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1088
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 13
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 13
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Updates Hawaii Revised Statutes title 24 by: requiring health care providers to continue providing services during a health insurer insolvency; moving the short-term health insurance preexisting disclosure requirement from section 431:10-104(5) to chapter 431, article 10A; amending the definition of "perceived gender identity" to correct a technical drafting error; including health insurers as part of the guaranty association; and making technical, nonsubstantive amendments for clarity and consistency.
Title
Relating To Health Insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | House | Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 13 |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1088 (Carry Over) 2017-02-03 - Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 13
SB954 (Same As) 2017-03-16 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB954 (Same As) 2017-03-16 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Accident and Health or Sickness Insurance
Affordable Care Act
Continuation of Benefits
Disclaimer
Flesch Reading Ease Test
General Readability Requirements
Health Care Provider
Insolvency
Life and Disability Insurance Guaranty Association
Limited Benefit Plan
Member Insurer
Perceived Gender Identity
Preexisting Condition
Short-Term Health Insurance
Affordable Care Act
Continuation of Benefits
Disclaimer
Flesch Reading Ease Test
General Readability Requirements
Health Care Provider
Insolvency
Life and Disability Insurance Guaranty Association
Limited Benefit Plan
Member Insurer
Perceived Gender Identity
Preexisting Condition
Short-Term Health Insurance
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1088&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB1088_.HTM |