HI HB1097 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-16 - (S) Re-Referred to TIA/CPN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-16 - (S) Re-Referred to TIA/CPN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the $3 per day surcharge on rental motor vehicles beyond August 31, 2011, and deposits the money into the State Highway Fund. Effective July 1, 2011. (HB1097 HD1)
Title
Rental Motor Vehicle; Surcharge Tax; State Highway Fund; Operations; Maintenance
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | (S) Re-Referred to TIA/CPN, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to CPN, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 265). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Riviere voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fontaine, Pine, Thielen, Ward voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Floor amendment failed 5 (Representative(s) Chong, Ichiyama, M. Lee, McKelvey, Souki). Excused, 1 (Representative(s) Wooley). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Floor Amendment No. 5 offered by Rep. Fontaine | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 742) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-26 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Yamashita, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto, Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Tokioka. | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-25-11 3:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 105), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, Saiki, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Fontaine; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee, Luke. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-02-11 8:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1324 (Same As) 2011-04-14 - (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605).