HI HB1102 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1102
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends section 266-19.5(d), Hawaii Revised Statutes, for the purpose of increasing the total contract value and total aggregate value of capital advancement contracts entered into by the Department of Transportation for harbor improvements and adds reporting requirements for the department.
Title
Relating To Capital Advancement Contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1102 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3
SB1400 (Same As) 2023-03-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
SB1400 (Same As) 2023-03-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1102&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB1102_.HTM |