HI HB1117 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-11 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-11 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the general excise tax exemption for housing projects built on federal lands. Provides that tax revenues gained from repealing this exemption shall be deposited into the rental housing trust fund for the purpose of building affordable rental housing for homeless families with children.
Title
General Excise Tax; Exemption for Housing Projects Built on Federal Lands; Repeal; Rental Housing Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 02-11-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Fukumoto, Hanohano, Takai voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Cachola, Say excused (2). |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 133), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2013-02-04 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Morikawa, Cheape; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Jordan. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 02-04-13 8:45AM in conference room 329. |
2013-02-01 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 02-04-13 8:45AM in conference room 329. |
2013-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 02-04-13 8:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to HSG, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |