HI HB1126 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1126
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the Department of Land and Natural Resources (Department) may assume immediate control of a vessel that is grounded on state submerged lands or on a shoreline. Clarifies that the Department may assume immediate control of a vessel grounded on a sand beach, sand bar, or mudflat not in imminent danger of breaking up after the owner has been given seventy-two hours' notice to remove the vessel and has not done so.
Title
Relating To Vessels Aground.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-06 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB992 (Same As)
HB1126 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB1126 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1126&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1126_.HTM |