HI HB1131 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to EDU, HTH.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to EDU, HTH.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a child to have a dental examination prior to entering any elementary, middle or intermediate, or high school for the first time in the State, beginning with the 2015-2016 school year. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB1131 HD2)
Title
School Entrance; Dental Examination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to EDU, HTH. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 327). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cheape, Evans, Fukumoto, Ichiyama, Kawakami, Morikawa, Takayama, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Fale, Hanohano, Har, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro, Say voting no (10) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 809) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-27 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Cabanilla, Carroll, Kobayashi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Cheape. |
2013-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-13 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2013-02-22 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-13 at 9:30am. |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-22-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Coffman, Har, Say excused (3). |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 379) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HLT. |
2013-02-06 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takai; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cheape, Fale; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-06-13 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to EDN, HLT, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |