HI HB1131 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a candidate or candidate committee from accepting more than twenty per cent of its total contributions from lobbyists during an election period. Prohibits a lobbyist from contributing more than an aggregate $20,000 to all candidates and candidate committees during an election period.
Title
Campaign Contributions; Lobbyist
Sponsors
Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-27 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1131&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1131_.HTM |