HI HB1139 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1139
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a compliance and enforcement program within the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands to investigate complaints, conduct investigations, and cooperate with enforcement authorities to ensure compliance with all state laws and rules and county ordinances on Hawaiian Home Lands. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Compliance On Hawaiian Home Lands.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Kong [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB490 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB1139 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB1139 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1139&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1139_.HTM |