HI HB1186 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits persons convicted of cruelty to animals in the first degree and second degree from possessing, owning, or residing with any pet animal for a minimum of five years and one year, respectively, from the conviction date. Effective 01/01/2112.
Title
Animal Cruelty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3). |
2013-02-08 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 231) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-06 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Brower, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Cachola, Carroll, Har. |
2013-02-06 | House | Re-referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 17 |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-13. |
2013-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-04-13 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |